SALE MOOR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 520109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We hire rooms to individuals and other community groups, including health services. The building is owned by Trafford Council and the association are responsible for the upkeep of the interior only.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £22,496
Total expenditure: £29,986

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Animals
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Trafford

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 March 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SALE MOOR COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Howard Woodyatt Chair 07 July 2015
None on record
Councillor Will Jones Trustee 12 November 2024
None on record
Carole Barley Trustee 12 November 2024
THE SALE U3A
Received: On time
Kathryn Fyfe Trustee 12 November 2024
THE SALE U3A
Received: On time
Jamie Rennie Trustee 12 November 2024
None on record
Douglas Craddock Trustee 07 March 2021
None on record
Louise Cowman Trustee 12 July 2016
None on record
Janet Plumb Trustee 11 July 2016
SALE EAST CHILDMINDING ASSOCIATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 1567 days
Helen Rock Trustee 21 May 2016
None on record
Chris Boyes Trustee 10 May 2016
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (NORTH WESTERN PROVINCE) TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Christine Woodyatt Trustee 07 July 2015
None on record
Jose Anderson Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.49k £24.37k £28.08k £17.89k £22.50k
Total expenditure £20.55k £21.79k £23.81k £20.02k £29.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.00k £14.10k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 May 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
113 BROOK LANE
TIMPERLEY
ALTRINCHAM
WA15 6RT
Phone:
01619803533
Website:

No information available