SHERN HALL METHODIST CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a place for Christian Methodist Worship. We believe that God has called us to be a transforming, united Church of Jesus Christ's disciples, who are growing as followers, obedient to the word of God and have a passion to serve God's church and community.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 29 March 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Oseias Barbosa da Silva | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||
William Poku-Adu | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Sambani | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Hannah Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Abena Adofo | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
June Carole Campbell | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Emmannuel Kusi | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Sonia Jennifer Whitfield | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Kathleen Hudson | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Donald Espeute | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Millicent Patience Freeman | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
DEREEN OMARD | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Evangelica Marietta Solomon | Trustee | 01 September 2009 |
|
|
||||||||
CYNTHIA VILMA BONDS | Trustee | 01 September 2009 |
|
|
||||||||
Ciddra Skerritt | Trustee | 01 September 2009 |
|
|
||||||||
Elvena Bernita Brumant | Trustee | 01 September 2009 |
|
|||||||||
Loyl Marcia Brandt | Trustee | 01 September 2009 |
|
|||||||||
Claudina A Green | Trustee | 01 September 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 26 OCT 1976
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHERNHALL METHODIST CHURCH
SHERNHALL STREET
LONDON
E17 9HX
- Phone:
- 02085205912
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.