ST MARTIN'S YOUTH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre provides activities for young people aged 10-19. The programme includes media & music, arts, crafts & dance workshops, sports activities, holiday programmes, residentials and open access sessions. For those involved in/likely to be involved in, antisocial/criminal behaviour the Centre provides alternative challenges. The Centre is a community resource which can be hired for events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 26 July 1965: Standard registration
- 09 October 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 03 December 2009: Standard registration
- ST MARTINS YOUTH & COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JEREMY ROBERT ALLCOCK | Chair | 11 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Stephen Blaire-Chappell | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Laurence Jones | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE WRIGHT | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR LEWIS | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET KATHLEEN CAREY CAMERON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.46k | £87.21k | £36.35k | £83.00k | £46.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.92k | £57.15k | £49.07k | £62.88k | £77.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £74.52k | £12.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 MAY 1965
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE GIRLS AND BOYS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST MARTIN'S YOUTH & COMMUNITY CTR
GOOCH STREET
HIGHGATE
BIRMINGHAM
B5 7HE
- Phone:
- 01216222005
- Website:
-
www://smycc.blogspot.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window