LOWER BEBINGTON SCHOOL LANDS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 525849
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity, founded in 1654 by Thomas Green, makes small grants to individuals in university or other higher education, who reside in the area of the parish of St Andrews, Lower Bebington, as it was in 1924. (owing to poor drafting when state education was introduced it cannot be adjusted to suit the current boundary, but see the Poulton Lancelyn Lands Foundation (1998) which covers omitted areas

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017

Total income: £3,158
Total expenditure: £4,300

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 October 1964: Standard registration
  • 08 November 2018: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 08 November 2018: Funds transferred to 1071450 The Lower Bebington and Poulton Lancelyn Lands Fou...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017
Total gross income £3.23k £3.30k £3.12k £3.16k £3.16k
Total expenditure £2.40k £2.20k £3.00k £2.83k £4.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2017 29 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 16 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 16 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required