THE APPRENTICING AND RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of assistance for young persons resident in the town of Warwick under the age of 24 in their advancement in life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 03 October 1963: Standard registration
- WARWICK APPRENTICING CHARITIES (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERRY RICHARD BROWN | Chair |
|
||||||||||||
Rev Canon Angus Robert Aagaard | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Eva Elizabeth Harrison | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
John Louis George Vedy | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
John Paul Sullivan | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Simon Leslie Pargeter | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Pauline Margaret Fawcett | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Neil Fraser James Thurley | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Moira-Ann Grainger | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Stephen Arthur Morley | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Jonathan Hearn | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.17k | £41.01k | £40.49k | £37.04k | £70.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.96k | £40.75k | £62.16k | £64.65k | £87.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 21 OCTOBER 1981
Charitable objects
1) ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE IN ASSISTING PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE TOWN OF WARWICK WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE AND WHO ARE PREPARING FOR, ENTERING UPON, OR ENGAGED IN ANY PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE BY PROVIDING THEM WITH OUTFITS, TOOLS OR BOOKS, OR BY PAYMENT OF FEES, TRAVELLING OR MAINTENANCE EXPENSES OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS FOR THEIR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE TO ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR OWN LIVING. 2) RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE TOWN OF WARWICK WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
TOWN OF WARWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 HIGH STREET
WARWICK
CV34 4BE
- Phone:
- 01926491181
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window