BBC CHILDREN IN NEED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity?s objects are to further such exclusively charitable objects and purposes in any part of the United Kingdom, the Channel Islands and the Isle of Man as the Directors may in their discretion think fit and in particular (without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing) to relieve need, hardship, sickness, handicap and distress amongst children and young persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£54,912,249
Donations and legacies | £49.84m | |
Charitable activities | £2.15m | |
Other trading activities | £890.02k | |
Investments | £1.35m | |
Other | £676.63k |
Total expenditure:
£49,240,729
Raising funds | £7.74m | |
Charitable activities | £41.50m | |
Other | £0 |
£3,802,003 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £7.74m | |
Charitable expenditure | £41.50m | |
Retained for future use | £5.67m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £7.74m | |
Charitable expenditure | £41.50m | |
Retained for future use | £9.47m |
People

152 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 6 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- BBC CHILDREN IN NEED (Previous name)
- THE BBC CHILDREN IN NEED APPEAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Hidalgo | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Thomas | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Wallace | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Tavaziva | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cherrie Bija | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
RANDEL BRYAN | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Fairclough | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rhona Burns | Trustee | 02 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Munro | Trustee | 02 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUZY LAMB | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Clifton | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Bradley | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kenny Imafidon | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.79m | £65.57m | £69.93m | £50.08m | £54.91m | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.89m | £59.55m | £74.52m | £39.82m | £49.24m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.51m | £2.50m | £12.17m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £82.30m | £56.73m | £52.83m | £46.08m | £49.84m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £890.02k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.97m | £7.19m | £15.88m | £2.36m | £2.15m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £894.65k | £1.00m | £564.20k | £952.00k | £1.35m | |
|
Income - Other | £615.60k | £649.32k | £656.08k | £683.00k | £676.63k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.07m | £2.74m | £2.15m | £2.86m | £3.38m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £53.42m | £54.45m | £67.73m | £32.42m | £41.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.47m | £5.10m | £6.80m | £7.41m | £7.74m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £242.50k | £259.69k | £314.15k | £358.00k | £434.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £47.92m | £49.85m | £62.25m | £26.30m | £35.71m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £154.61k | £139.84k | £116.39k | £119.00k | £116.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £123.09k | £97.25k | £27.64k | £8.00k | £27.70k | |
|
Long-term investments | £24.24m | £28.89m | £15.67m | £18.85m | £29.39m | |
|
Other assets | £104.36m | £78.00m | £86.17m | £71.68m | £72.70m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £85.90m | £56.86m | £64.39m | £42.86m | £44.97m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/02/2012 as amended on 26 Jun 2019 as amended on 23 Jul 2019 as amended on 23 Jul 2019 as amended on 12 Nov 2019 as amended on 02 Nov 2021 as amended on 09 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
The Charity's objects are to further such exclusively charitable objects and purposes in any part of the United Kingdom, the Channel Islands and the Isle of Man as the Trustees think fit and in particular to advance life and help children and young people, in particular (without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing) through the relief of need, hardship, ill-health, disability and distress.
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Linked charities
- 07 August 2003 : Standard registration
- 15 June 2020 : Removed
- 15 June 2020 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
4th Floor
DOCK HOUSE
SALFORD
GREATER MANCHESTER
M50 2LH
- Phone:
- 03456090015
- Email:
- pudsey@bbc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window