THE QUEEN ELIZABETH SCHOLARSHIP TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Granting craft scholarships On 1st September 2013 the Charity passed all its assets ( and liabilities) to Queen Elizabeth Scholarship Trust Limited, Charity Number1152032. This succeeding Charity continued the activities of the original Charity (Number 802557)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 December 1989: Standard registration
- 01 March 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 01 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1152032 QUEEN ELIZABETH SCHOLARSHIP TRUST LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.00k | £957.36k | £1.44m | £187.28k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £258.06k | £429.10k | £549.15k | £357.35k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £760.37k | £1.12m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £116.14k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £196.99k | £201.80k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £233.18k | £399.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £28.67k | £23.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £302.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £2.48k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 08 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 18 September 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 30 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 21 July 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DTED 1ST DECEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED 30 JANUARY 1996
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN MODERN AND TRADITIONAL CRAFTS AND SIMILAR SKILLS PARTICULARLY THOSE ASSOCIATED WITH ROYAL WARRANT HOLDING FIRMS BY THE MAKING OF ONE OR MORE GRANTS, SCHOLARSHIPS AND PRIZES TO INDIVIDUALS TRAINING IN SUCH CRAFTS OR SKILLS OR BY ANY OTHER MEANS. 2. THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window