PETERSFIELD MUSICAL FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To run an annual music festival in Petersfield in March, which consists of concerts by local choral societies and orchestras, celebrity concerts, recitals, and youth concerts for young singers and musicians from local schools. To run choral workshops and competitions for young composers. To assist young musicians by making financial awards towards their tuition or instruments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £5,750 from 3 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 16 May 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Jeanne Buckley | Chair | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Charlotte Anne Beck | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Charles Innes Stoneman | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Simon O'Hea | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Susan Wyn Bint | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Simon Jonathan Mason | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||
SARAH HARD | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Geoffrey Michael John Culbertson | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Sheila Kay Rowe | Trustee | 23 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Tony Newberry | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
MARCIA JANE FIELDEN | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
NANCY ELIZABETH BUCK | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
ADRIAN PHILIP YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MS SALLY MAYBURY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.26k | £4.78k | £41.95k | £47.65k | £51.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.88k | £2.84k | £40.24k | £48.55k | £52.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.05k | N/A | £6.00k | £6.00k | £5.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 10 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 10 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 May 2021 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 07 May 2021 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH JULY 1982 AS AMENDED 18 JULY 2005 as amended on 21 Sep 2018 as amended on 16 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN THE APPRECIATION OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CHORAL CONCERTS AND RECITALS, INCLUDING AN ANNUAL FESTIVAL TO BE HELD IN AND AROUND PETERSFIELD ("THE FESTIVAL"), AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS HE SOCIETY, THROUGH THE COMMITTEE, SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 STONEHAM PARK
PETERSFIELD
GU32 3BT
- Phone:
- 01730 260344
- Email:
- simonmason8@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window