Dogfen lywodraethu THE HALL FOR CORNWALL PROPERTY TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JULY 1990 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 DECEMBER 1992, 19 SEPTEMBER 1993, 18 MARCH 1995, 9 MARCH 1996 AND 26 AUGUST 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 AUG 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, BALLET, MUSIC, SINGING, LITERATURE, SCULPTURE AND PAINTING. (B) TO RESTORE AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CITY HALL TRURO BEING A BUILDING OF HISTORIC ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST. (C) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF CORNWALL WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Maes buddion
TRURO, CORNWALL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.