Dogfen lywodraethu THE BECK COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JULY 1991 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/04/2015 as amended on 27 Apr 2019 as amended on 21 Apr 1922
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE, POLITICS, RELIGION, DISABILITY OR OTHER OPINION. 2.TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE COMMUNITY CENTRE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER BODY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS
Maes buddion
BOUNDED BY WINDERMERE RAILWAY LINE, TO OXENHOLME ROAD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.