Dogfen lywodraethu PROSTATE CANCER UK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/10/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/01/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/08/2012 as amended on 22 Nov 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO: 4.1.1 ENCOURAGE, SUPPORT AND CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF PROSTATE CANCER AND OTHER PROSTATE DISEASES AND THEIR EFFECTS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH 4.1.2 EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ON THE ISSUES RELATING TO PROSTATE CANCER AND OTHER PROSTATE DISEASES; 4.1.3 PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AMONG MEN AFFECTED BY PROSTATE CANCER AND/OR PROSTATE DISEASES, THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND INFORMATION AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.