Dogfen lywodraethu Springboard Chippenham
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/03/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2013 as amended on 25 Sep 2019 as amended on 25 Sep 2019 as amended on 25 Sep 2019 as amended on 10 Nov 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE SAFE AND STIMULATING GROUP PLAY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS OF PRE-SCHOOL AGE IN NORTH WILTSHIRE AND FOR THE SUPPORT OF THE PARENTS, CARERS AND FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION.
Maes buddion
NORTH WILTSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.