Dogfen lywodraethu THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF ULTRASOUND IN OBSTETRICS AND GYNECOLOGY
Rhif yr elusen: 1030406

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (36 diwrnod yn hwyr)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/06/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 SEP 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH BY PROMOTING THE SCIENCE OF ULTRASOUND IN OBSTETRICS AND GYAECOLOGY AND EDUCATION THEREIN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.