THE RIFLES AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Promoting Army efficiency by: contact between past and present members of The Rifles, the RGBW its forming and antecedent regts; fostering esprit de corps; and, addressing hardship. This is exercised by: promoting past deeds; encouraging museums and their day to day operation; making grants to 1054647, the Regimental Trust; support to memorials; and, observing other powers within the Constitution.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Hawliau Dynol/cytgord Crefyddol Neu Hiliol/cydraddoldeb Neu Amrywiaeth
- Hamdden
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Bracknell Forest
- De Swydd Gaerloyw
- Dinas Bryste
- Gorllewin Berkshire
- Reading
- Slough
- Swydd Gaerloyw
- Wiltshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Ynys Wyth
Llywodraethu
- 23 Medi 2022: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1119061 THE RIFLES REGIMENTAL TRUST
- 09 Mehefin 1994: Cofrestrwyd
- 23 Medi 2022: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
- REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION OF THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENT (Enw blaenorol)
- THE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION OF THE RIFLES AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENT (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £22.93k | £22.26k | £19.03k | £11.33k | £188 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £51.31k | £96.21k | £45.38k | £425.56k | £41.24k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 21 Medi 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 28 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 04 Chwefror 2021 | 4 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 28 Ionawr 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 APRIL 1994 AS AMENDED 1 JUNE 1996, 5 JULY 1998 AND 20 MARCH 1999. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30 JUN 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE RIFLES AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENT ASSOCIATION ("THE ASSOCIATION" AND "THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMY BY: (A) MAINTAINING CONTACT BETWEEN PAST OR PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE RIFLES ("THE REGIMENT") AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE REGIMENT ("RGBW"), THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE REGIMENT (28TH AND 61ST), THE ROYAL BERKSHIRE REGIMENT (PRINCESS CHARLOTTE OF WALES'S), THE WILTSHIRE REGIMENT (DUKE OF EDINBURGH'S), THE DUKE OF EDINBURGH'S ROYAL REGIMENT (BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE) AND THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY ("THE FORMER REGIMENTS"), FOSTERING MUTUAL FRIENDSHIP AND PROVIDING SOCIAL GATHERINGS FOR THEM; (B) FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS, COMRADESHIP AND WELFARE OF THE REGIMENT AND PRESERVING ITS TRADITIONS AND THOSE OF THE FORMER REGIMENTS; (C) RELIEVING, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT AND THE FORMER REGIMENTS, THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS ("BENEFICIARIES").
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window