Dogfen lywodraethu ADFERIAD RECOVERY LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/09/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/06/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/07/2004 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/06/2015 as amended on 09 Jun 2021 as amended on 26 Jun 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2 The charity's objects are specifically restricted to the following for the public benefit: 2.1 to relieve people in need and their families, dependants and/or carers, where such need is due to disadvantages including: 2.1.1 addiction and other dependencies, including alcohol and drug misuse and gambling; 2.1.2 mental and physical ill health, with a particular focus on serious mental illness, poor psychological and emotional well-being, learning disabilities, and the effects of high-pressure work environments (including in particular the military and emergency services); 2.1.3 age; 2.1.4 having been offenders and/or being at risk of offending; 2.1.5 social exclusion; 2.1.6 poverty; 2.1.7 having complex and/or co-occurring needs across one or more of the preceding categories; by means including (but not limited to): 2.1.8 the provision of treatment, care, advice, advocacy, support, information and counselling to such persons; 2.1.9 assistance in the rehabilitation and recovery of such persons; 2.1.10 the reduction or prevention of harms and the causes of harms associated with such need, including by the provision of interventions and other treatment; 2.1.11 the provision of training and employment opportunities; and 2.1.12 working with and in the communities where such need is identified to alleviate any disadvantage, inequality, prejudice and discrimination contributing to such need. 2.2 to advance the education: 2.2.1 and training of any person in the care or treatment of people in need as described in Article 2.1; and 2.2.2 of the public in all aspects of such need including the manner by which it is both caused and alleviated.
Maes buddion
WALES AND THE MARCHES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.