Dogfen lywodraethu THE HALL FOR CORNWALL TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 SEPTEMBER 1995 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 9 MARCH 1996, 12 SEPTEMBER 1996 AND 26 AUGUST 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 AUG 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, BALLET, MUSIC, SINGING, LITERATURE, SCULPTURE AND PAINTING. (B) TO RESTORE AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CITY HALL TRURO BEING A BUILDING OF HISTORIC ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST. (C) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF CORNWALL WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Maes buddion
TRURO, CORNWALL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.