Dogfen lywodraethu THE HAMPSHIRE DOWN SHEEP BREEDERS ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 APRIL 1890 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JULY 1996 AND 25 OCTOBER 2003. AS AMENDED ON 03 NOV 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 NOV 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO CARRY OUT BREED SOCIETY FUNCTIONS IN RECORDING PEDIGREES OF HAMPSHIRE DOWN SHEEP AND TO PROMOTE THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF AGRICULTURE BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF BREEDING HAMPSHIRE DOWN SHEEP AT HOME AND ABROAD.
Maes buddion
HOME AND ABROAD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.