Dogfen lywodraethu ELTHAM COLLEGE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH AUGUST 1996 AS AMENDED 29 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 JUN 2018 as amended on 08 Jun 2023 as amended on 21 Jun 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the Charity (the ?Objects?) are, for the public benefit, to advance the education of children and young people by (without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing) the provision of a school or schools, in particular but not exclusively, those conducted in accordance with the ethos and values of the Christian faith and those with a preference for the admission of children of Protestant missionaries subject to the discretion of the Trustees.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SOUTH LONDON AND KENT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.