Hanes ariannol THE CHELSEA CENTRE LTD
Rhif yr elusen: 1060460
Up to date (174 days late)
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £3.09m | £465.43k | £410.58k | £612.92k | £683.94k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £442.06k | £505.41k | £577.57k | £781.46k | £934.75k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £329.05k | N/A | £314.44k | £350.98k | £123.00k | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | £2.94m | N/A | N/A | £396.17k | £483.19k | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | £140.19k | N/A | N/A | £216.63k | £195.76k | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | £7.89k | N/A | N/A | £118 | £5.00k | |
|
Incwm - Arall | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | £404.07k | N/A | N/A | £781.46k | £934.75k | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | £29.50k | N/A | N/A | £32.03k | £16.49k | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | £37.99k | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.