Dogfen lywodraethu THE RICHMOND FELLOWSHIP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/06/1960 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/05/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/11/1963 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/03/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/10/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2013 as amended on 30 Jan 2020 as amended on 21 May 2024 as amended on 21 May 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE A HOME AND COMMUNITY LIFE FOR THE FELLOWSHIP'S BENEFICIARIES; TO ASSIST AND TREAT THE FELLOWSHIP'S BENEFICIARIES; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF THE FELLOWSHIP'S BENEFICIARIES; AND TO ADVANCE OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES. "THE FELLOWSHIP'S BENEFICIARIES" MEAN ANY PERSON WHO HAS MENTAL OR PHYSICAL HEALTH PROBLEMS; HAS A LEARNING DISABILITY; HAS PROBLEMS WITH ALCOHOL OR SUBSTANCE ABUSE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.