Dogfen lywodraethu THE NATIONAL TRUST FOR PLACES OF HISTORIC INTEREST OR NATURAL BEAUTY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
ACT OF PARLIAMENT THE NATIONAL TRUST ACTS, 1907, 1919, 1937, 1953 AND 1971 STATUTORY INSTRUMENT 1975 NO 1155. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS SEALED 12/01/2005 (AS EFFECTED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT 2005 NO. 712) AMENDED 2/07/2008, 21/01/2009, 19/05/2010, 22/03/2016, 17/06/2020 AND 23/03/2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION OF LANDS AND TENEMENTS (INCLUDING BUILDINGS) OF BEAUTY OR HISTORIC INTEREST AND, AS REGARDS LANDS, FOR THE PRESERVATION (AS FAR AS PRACTICABLE) OF THEIR NATURAL ASPECT, FEATURES AND ANIMAL AND PLANT LIFE. ALSO THE PRESERVATION OF FURNITURE, PICTURES AND CHATTELS OF ANY DESCRIPTION HAVING NATIONAL AND HISTORIC OR ARTISTIC INTEREST. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE THE NATIONAL TRUST ACTS, 1907 TO 1971).
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.