Dogfen lywodraethu JOHN GROOMS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JANUARY 1911, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ADOPTED 20/1/1914, 20/6/1940, 6/9/1945, 27/3/1952, 5/7/1956,25/9/1969, 8/6/1981, 9/1/1990, & 5/10/1998
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO CARE FOR RELIEVE MAINTAIN KEEP ASSIST EMPLOY EDUCATE REHABILITATE INTEGRATE AND ENCOURAGE TO ACHIEVE A LEVEL OF INDEPENDENT LIVING PERSONS WHO ARE IN ANY WAY DISABLED OR OTHERWISE IN NEED AND THEIR CARERS (B) TO PROMOTE THE ACTIVITIES SET OUT IN CLAUSE 3(A) ABOVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND ITS MORAL PRINCIPLES BASED ON HOLY SCRIPTURE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.