Dogfen lywodraethu JOHN SUGARS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Rhif yr elusen: 214681

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF 19 NOVEMBER 1907 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 2 JUNE 1939, 1 OCTOBER 1940 AND 21 APRIL 1961 AND SCHEME OF 19 APRIL 2007
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR SIX POOR WIDOWS OF NOT LESS THAN 55 YEARS OF AGE AND OF GOOD CHARACTER.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
FORMER ANCIENT PARISH OF ALL SAINTS SOUTH LYNN
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.