Trosolwg o'r elusen THE TEMPLE BALSALL AMALGAMATED CHARITIES
Rhif yr elusen: 1146710-2
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
SCHEME DATED 10 JUN 1888
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10 JUL 1888
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25 MAR 1891
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19 APR 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THOSE IN FINANCIAL NEED, THE ELDERLY AND THOSE IN POOR HEALTH BY
PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH
PERSONS
Maes buddion
PARISH OF TEMPLE BALSALL (AS CONSTITUTED ON 10 JULY 1888)
Hanes cofrestru
- 11 Ebrill 1963: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
Dim enwau eraill
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.