Dogfen lywodraethu THE HEREFORDSHIRE WILDLIFE TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/12/1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 OCT 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF: 1) WILDLIFE CONSIDERED TO BE WORTHY OF PROTECTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AND ITS HABITATS; 2)PLACES OF NATURAL BEAUTY; 3)PLACES OF ZOOLOGICAL, BOTANICAL, GEOGRAPHICAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST; 4)FEATURES OF LANDSCAPE WITH GEOLOGICAL AND PHYSIOGRAPHICAL VALUE. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND BOIDIVERSITY CONSERVATION. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH IN ALL BRANCHES OF THE STUDY OF THE NATURAL WORLD WHICH WILL BE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO RECORD AND/OR PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE HEREFORDSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.