Dogfen lywodraethu THE NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/05/1924 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/03/1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/04/1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/11/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/01/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2012 as amended on 26 Nov 2021 as amended on 12 Dec 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
5.1 The Objects of the Charity are for the public benefit: (a) to advance or promote all or any purposes which are exclusively charitable and for the public benefit in accordance with the laws of England and Wales; and. (b) to promote and organise co-operation in the furtherance of such purposes.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.