Dogfen lywodraethu THE ROYAL INSTITUTION OF GREAT BRITAIN
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
GRANTED 13/01/1800 AS AMENDED BY ACT OF PARLIAMENT DATED 18/04/1810 AS AMENDED BY THE ROYAL INSTITUTION OF GREAT BRITAIN CHARITY SCHEME CONFIRMATION ACT DATED 14/05/1958 SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER GRANTED 14/11/1958 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17/04/1959 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26/05/1959 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/03/1965 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26/01/1967 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 22/02/1967 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26/04/1971 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10/04/1984 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 11/04/1984 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 07/04/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO DIFFUSE THE KNOWLEDGE AND FACILITATE THE GENERAL INTRODUCTION OF USEFUL MECHANICAL INVENTIONS AND IMPROVEMENTS; (2) TO TEACH BY COURSES OF PHILOSOPHICAL LECTURES AND EXPERIMENTS THE APPLICATION OF SCIENCE TO THE COMMON PURPOSES OF LIFE; (3) TO PROMOTE CHEMICAL SCIENCE BY EXPERIMENTS AND LECTURES FOR IMPROVING ARTS AND MANUFACTURES; (4) TO DISCOVER THE USES OF THE MINERAL AND OTHER NATURAL PRODUCTIONS OF THIS COUNTRY; AND (5) TO DIFFUSE AND EXTEND USEFUL KNOWLEDGE IN GENERAL.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.