Dogfen lywodraethu RICHARD HENRY HOLMES MASONIC BENEVOLENT FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION APPROVED 15TH NOVEMBER 1977 AND AMENDED 20TH APRIL 1978, 14TH NOVEMBER 1983, 24 OCTOBER 2001 AND 2 MARCH 2009 as amended on 21 Mar 2019 as amended on 30 Oct 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A. TO MAKE GRANTS OR LOANS TO FREEMASONS, THE WIVES, PARTNERS, CHILDREN, GRANDCHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDENTS OF FREEMASONS AND THE WIDOWS, FORMER PARTNERS, CHILDREN, GRANDCHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDENTS OF DECEASED FREEMASONS. B. TO MAKE DONATIONS OR LOANS TO LOCAL MASONIC AND NON-MASONIC CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS AND WORTHY CAUSES. C. TO GIVE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE IN EXCEPTIONAL OR URGENT CASES AND IN SO FAR AS THE FOREGOING OBJECTS HAVE BEEN EXHAUSTED TO GIVE RELIEF OR ASSISTANCE WITHIN AND OUTWITH THE UNITED KINGDOM. D. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND CARRY OUT OR SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.