Dogfen lywodraethu SOMERSET WILDLIFE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/09/1964 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/06/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/10/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE, PROTECTION AND ENJOYMENT OF: (I) WILDLIFE AND ITS HABITATS; (II) PLACES OF ZOOLOGICAL, BOTANICAL, GEOGRAPHICAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST; (III) FEATURES OF LANDSCAPE WITH GEOLOGICAL OR PHYSIOGRAPHICAL VALUE; (IV) PLACES OF NATURAL BEAUTY IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROMOTING BIODIVERSITY. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN: (I) THE PRINCIPLES OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT; (II) THE PRINCIPLES OF BIODIVERSITY CONSERVATION. (3) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH IN ALL BRANCHES OF NATURE STUDY, IN ECOLOGY AND GEOLOGY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE SOMERSET
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.