Dogfen lywodraethu The Reverend Dr George Richards Charity for Poor Clergy
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF 19/04/1850 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 09/12/1949, 07/12/1965, 05/11/1974 AND 11/04/1984. as amended on 03 Nov 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF CLERGYMEN OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND WHO ARE DESERVING OF ASSISTANCE AND HAVE THROUGH AGE OR INFIRMITY BECOME INCAPABLE OF PERFORMING THEIR CLERICAL DUTIES OR ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE IN THE PERFORMANCE THEREOF. IN THE PAYMENT OF PENSIONS OF SUCH AMOUNT AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 2. IF AND SO FAR AS INCOME OF THE CHARITY IS NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION IN ANY YEAR IN MANNER AFORESAID THE SAME MAY BE APPLIED IN GRANTS OF MONEY FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID AND THEIR WIDOWS AND DEPENDANTS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.