Dogfen lywodraethu READING YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JULY 1980, AS AMENDED 24 SEPTEMBER 1984, 12 DECEMBER 1988, 12 JULY 1993 AND 11 JULY 1994.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FIRST, TO LEAD YOUNG PEOPLE TO THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND FULLNESS OF LIFE IN HIM AND; SECONDLY, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO MEET THE SPIRITUAL, MENTAL AND PHYSICAL NEEDS OF BOTH ITS MEMBERS AND THE COMMUNITY BY AND THROUGH ACTIVITIES, LEISURE AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES, TRAINING AND EDUCATION, AND THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Maes buddion
READING
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.