Dogfen lywodraethu FRATERNITY OF THE FRIENDS OF SAINT ALBANS ABBEY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED THE 21ST JUNE 1951, AMENDED 24 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED ON 23 SEP 2017 as amended on 22 Sep 2018 as amended on 22 Sep 2018 as amended on 13 May 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The charity's objects are the support of the Cathedral and Abbey Church of Saint Alban and the promotion of its dignity, traditions and influence, in particular by: (1) providing a network to link members to the life and work of the Cathedral and Abbey Church. (2) giving practical and financial support to projects which enhance the Cathedral and Abbey Church and its precincts and which are endorsed by the Chapter of the Cathedral and Abbey Church of Saint Alban.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.