THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE YEOMANRY ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To help all ex -serving members of The Northamptonshire Yeomanry or their dependants
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2023
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Anabledd
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Swydd Northampton
Llywodraethu
- 28 Ebrill 1969: Cofrestrwyd
- 16 Ionawr 2025: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £2.42k | £2.83k | £2.76k | £1.94k | £1.25k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £4.81k | £1.36k | £1.32k | £1.96k | £27.26k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 15 Chwefror 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 27 Chwefror 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 15 Chwefror 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 09 Chwefror 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 25 Chwefror 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
AS AFFECTED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER S74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 04/01/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) IN THE ASSISTANCE OR BENEFIT OF ANY SUCH PERSONS SERVING OR HAVING AT ANY TIME SERVED IN THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE YEOMANRY OR BEING DEPENDENTS, WIVES, WIDOWS (WHETHER OR NOT RE-MARRIED) OR ISSUE OF PERSONS (WHETHER LIVING OR DEAD SERVING OR HAVING SERVED IN THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE YEOMANRY AS MAY FOR THE TIME BEING BE IN NEED OF CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE OR BENEFIT. B) IN MAKING GRANTS TO ANY CHARITY OR CHARITABLE FUND OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTION (WHETHER THE SAME BE A MILITARY OR CIVIL CHARITY) EXISTING OR HERE-AFTER ESTABLISHED WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE MANAGING TRUSTEES DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY BENEFITS THE PERSONS REFERRED TO IN (A) ABOVE WHETHER OR NOT THE OBJECTS OF ANY SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITABLE FUND OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTION SHALL EXPRESSLY INCLUDE PROVISIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS. C) IN MAKING GRANTS AND CONTRIBUTIONS TO THE COMMEMORATIVE EVENTS ARRANGED AND APPROVED BY THE NYA WHICH HAVE BEEN SET UP TO REMEMBER THOSE WHO HAVE PREVIOUSLY SERVED WITH THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE YEOMANRY AND TO KEEP THE SPIRIT OF THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE YEOMANRY ALIVE AND IN ADDITION TO MAKE GRANTS AND CONTRIBUTIONS TO COMMEMORATIVE RESEARCH ACTIVITIES IN A MANNER IN WHICH THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window