Dogfen lywodraethu S L G CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED
Rhif yr elusen: 261722

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 SEPTEMBER 1970 AND SCHEME OF 6 NOVEMBER 1973 AND SCHEME OF 6 JULY 1984, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 29 JUNE 2000 as amended on 14 Nov 2019 as amended on 14 Nov 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK CARRIED ON FOR THE TIME BEING BY THE COMMUNITY OF THE SISTERS OF THE LOVE OF GOD.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.