Dogfen lywodraethu THE CAMERON FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 OCTOBER 1970 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 16 JUNE 1971, 14 JUNE 1972, 22 JUNE 1994, 11 JULY 1994 AND 11 JUNE 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 AUG 2017 as amended on 06 Aug 2020 as amended on 05 Aug 2021 as amended on 14 May 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF GENERAL MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS, EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF NECESSITOUS CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS, AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE INCORPORATED BODY IN GENERAL MEETING (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION DATED 31/05/2016)
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.