Trosolwg o’r elusen READING SAMARITANS
Rhif yr elusen: 1170632-1
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/11/1970
AS AMENDED ON 13/10/1985
AS AMENDED ON 23/06/1986
AS AMENDED ON 27/11/2003
AS AMENDED ON 30 JAN 2016
AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE:
2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN READING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND
2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Maes buddion
READING AND SURROUNDING AREA
Hanes cofrestru
- 15 Chwefror 1972: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
- READING SAMARITANS (Enw blaenorol)
- THE SAMARITANS OF READING (Enw blaenorol)
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.