Dogfen lywodraethu THE ELGAR FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 SEPTEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED 8/3/1974, 14/5/1975,19/6/1977, 6/10/1988, 10/1/1995 AND 19/4/2000.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROMOTE IN EVERY PART OF THE WORLD PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE LIFE AND WORKS OF THE SIR EDWARD ELGAR. 2. TO MAINTAIN AND PRESERVE, OR ASSIST IN THE MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF THE BIRTHPLACE OF THE LATE SIR EDWARD ELGAR AT LOWER BROADHEATH WORCESTERSHIRE AND ANY OTHER PROPERTY OF NATIONAL INTEREST CONNECTED WITH SIR EDWARD ELGAR AND ACQUIRED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.