ST BARTHOLOMEW'S HOSPITAL CHORAL SOCIETY
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Barts Choir's objective is to promote the enjoyment of large scale choral singing. It ispossibly the largest regular amateur choir in London usually with over 300 performers and does not audition for membership. It normally promotes three concerts in each year in venues ranging in size up to the Royal Albert Hall often with leading orchestras. It aims to support a different charity each year.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2021
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Hamdden
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Llundain Fwyaf
Llywodraethu
- 22 Tachwedd 2022: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1197538 ST BARTHOLOMEW'S HOSPITAL CHORAL SOCIETY
- 13 Ebrill 1977: Cofrestrwyd
- 22 Tachwedd 2022: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
- BARTS CHOIR (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £169.71k | £153.19k | £225.15k | £30.70k | £54.31k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £168.96k | £168.63k | £197.39k | £30.16k | £65.21k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 22 Medi 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 22 Medi 2022 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 25 Hydref 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 25 Hydref 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 11 Medi 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 11 Medi 2020 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 01 Hydref 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 01 Hydref 2019 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31/01/1977 AS AMENDED ON 09/06/1994 AS AMENDED ON 12/07/2010 as amended on 05 Oct 2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I) TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIEM; AND (II) TO ADVANCE OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY APPLYING ALL OR PART OF THE PROFITS OF THE SAID PUBLIC CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITES BY MAKING DONATIONS TO SUCH OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES, ESPECIALLY THOSE OF A MEDICAL NATURE, AS THE COMMITTEE MAY SELECT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window