Dogfen lywodraethu THE HAVANT YOUTH SAIL TRAINING SCHEME
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/07/1979 AS AMENDED ON 01/02/1998 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/1999 AS AMENDED ON 13/09/2004 AS AMENDED ON 13/02/2012 as amended on 10 Mar 2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SAILING OPPORTUNITIES AND QUALIFICATIONS AS A CHALLENGING ACTIVITY . B) TO PROVIDE A SECURE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE SELF DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH QUALIFIED AND PROFESSIONAL GUIDANCE. C) TO WORK IN PARTNERSHIP WITH STATUTORY BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS WITHIN THE COMMUNITY TO DELIVER YOUTH WORK THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF SAILING AND WATERBORNE ACTIVITY. D) TO FACILITATE TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS WISHING TO WORK WITH YOUNG PEOPLE.
Maes buddion
HAVANT BOROUGH DISTRICT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.