Dogfen lywodraethu THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JULY 1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 OCTOBER 1991 AND 26 SEPTEMBER 1996, 3 JUNE 1998, 23 SEPTEMBER 1999, 27 SEPT 2000, 29 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 8 SEPTEMBER 2009.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS. 2. IN CARRYING OUT ITS OBJECTS AND IN ALL ASPECTS OF ITS WORK, THE CHARITY IS COMMITTED TO PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, TO PREVENTING PREJUDICE AND DISCRIMINATION, TO ENSURING EQUAL ACCESS TO AND TO PROMOTING GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN ALL SECTIONS OF THE COMMUNITY
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.