Dogfen lywodraethu INTERNATIONAL RESCUE CORPS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 AUGUST 1981 AS AMENDED 9 MARCH 1991, 2 NOVEMBER 1991, 27 MARCH 1993 AND 28 MARCH 1998
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO PROVIDE A FREE EMERGENCY RESCUE SERVICE TO ANY COUNTRY, INDIVIDUAL OR VICTIMS OF DISASTERS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD, REGARDLESS OF RACE, RELIGION OR ANY OTHER REASONABLE CONSIDERATION AND (2) TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF PERSONS BY INITIATING OR SUPPORTING HUMANITARIAN PROJECTS TO BE OFFERED TO FOREIGN COUNTRIES AND/OR SPECIALIST AGENCIES TO ENABLE THEM TO RESPOND SWIFTLY AND EFFECTIVELY TO ADVERSITY
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.