Dogfen lywodraethu INSTITUTE OF INTEGRATED SYSTEMIC THERAPY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/03/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/01/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/09/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CARE, TREATMENTS, AND REHABILITATION OF CHILDREN AND ADOLESCENTS WHO ARE PSYCHOLOGICALLY AND EMOTIONALLY DISTURBED, TO PROMOTE FULLER UNDERSTANDING AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE CAUSES OF PSYCHOLOGICAL AND SOCIAL DISTURBANCE AND WAYS IN WHICH THE CAUSES MAY BE REDUCED OR THEIR CONSEQUENCES AMELIORATED.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.