Dogfen lywodraethu PREMIER CHRISTIAN MEDIA TRUST

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH JULY 1983 AS AMENDED ON MARCH 6 2000. AS AMENDED ON 10 FEB 2004 AS AMENDED ON 08 OCT 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 MAR 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PRODUCING AND DISSEMINATING CONTENT WHICH DELIVERS THE MESSAGE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH VIA RADIO, DIGITAL AND PRINT MEDIA CHANNELS AND EVENTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.