Dogfen lywodraethu SITRA (SERVICES)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/11/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/05/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/01/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/02/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/01/2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE HOUSING, CARE AND SUPPORT NEEDS OF PERSONS WHO ARE POOR ILL AGED, DISABLED OR DISASVANTAGED BY PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION AND OTHER SERVICES THAT SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS; VOLUNTARY, CHARITABLE AND OTHER AGENCIES ON THE FUNDING, PROVISION, DEVELOPMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF HOUSING , CARE AND SUPPORT; AND ON MEETING THE NEEDS OF SERVICE USERS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.