Dogfen lywodraethu THE WORDSWORTH TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/12/1997 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/08/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/11/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/04/2011 as amended on 30 Jan 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE WORKS OF THE POET WILLIAM WORDSWORTH AND IN PARTICULAR TO MAINTAIN DOVE COTTAGE, GRASMERE AND ITS ENVIRONS AND TO PRESERVE AND DEVELOP THE TRUST'S PERMANENT COLLECTIONS AS A LIVING MEMORIAL TO HIM. B) TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND ENJOYMENT OF THE LITERATURE AND CULTURE OF THE ROMANTIC PERIOD (1750 TO 1850)
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.