Dogfen lywodraethu SAMUEL BUTLER'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 23/08/1968 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/05/1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11/10/1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/07/2013 as amended on 17 Sep 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
IN AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES, EXHIBITIONS, SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES. IN AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF CHRISTCHURCH WITH ALL SAINTS, SPITALFIELDS. ST.ANN, LIMEHOUSE. ST.DUNSTAN AND ALL SAINTS, STEPNEY. ST.AUGUSTINE WITH ST.PHILLIP, STEPNEY. ST.GEORGE IN THE EAST WITH CHRISTCHURCH AND ST.JOHN. ST.LEONARD, SHOREDITCH. ST.MATTHEW, BETHNAL GREEN. ST.PAUL, COVENT GARDEN. ST.PAUL WITH ST.MARK, WHITECHAPEL. ST.PAUL, SHADWELL WITH ST.JAMES, RATCLIFFE. ST.PETER, LONDON DOCKS WITH ST.JOHN OF WAPPING. ST.BOTOLPH WITHOUT ALDGATE AND HOLY TRINITIES, MINORIES. ST.BOTOLPH WITHOUT BISHOPSGATE AND THE UNITED PARISH OF SANDWICH IN THE COUNTY OF KENT TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION.
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.