Dogfen lywodraethu HEADINGTON SCHOOL OXFORD LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/07/1915 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/01/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/01/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/02/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/03/2014 as amended on 01 Dec 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To advance education for the benefit of the public in any way that the trustees see fit, including the provision, maintenance and support of a school or schools, wherein the core values and teaching shall reflect a broad Christian ethos, but also supporting pupils of all faiths and with none.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.