Dogfen lywodraethu ST EDWARD'S SCHOOL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/07/1911 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/03/1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/11/1953 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/11/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING, CONDUCTING, GOVERNING, CARRYING ON AND MAINTAINING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, OR ELSEWHERE, A BOARDING AND/OR DAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS IN WHICH THE TEACHING SHALL INCLUDE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.