Dogfen lywodraethu QUEENSWOOD SCHOOL LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 FEB 1894 AMENDED BY TRUST DEED OF 18 NOV 1953, SCHEME 19 AUG 1997, 22 NOV 2003 AND NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 NOV 2010 AND REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 NOV 2010.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING, BY THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT OF A BOARDING AND DAY SCHOOL FOR GIRLS IN WHICH THERE SHALL BE GIVEN A SOUND EDUCATION CONDUCTED ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN MORAL AND RELIGIOUS PRINCIPLES WHICH DOES NOT DENY OR REPUDIATE THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS OF THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Maes buddion
QUEENSWOOD OR ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.