Dogfen lywodraethu CLIFTON HIGH SCHOOL

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/09/1877 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/02/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/10/2012 as amended on 11 Mar 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Company’s object is for the benefit of the public to advance the education of the pupils at Clifton High School, Bristol or elsewhere by providing and/or assisting in the provision of facilities for education in such ways as the Council Members think fit from time to time including by carrying on or managing any Subsidiary, or affiliated or other schools (“Objects”).
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.